MO SCR28 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-03 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the President of the United States to designate a state funeral for the last surviving World War II Medal of Honor recipient
Title
Urges the President of the United States to designate a state funeral for the last surviving World War II Medal of Honor recipient
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House: SCR 28 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | H adopted |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2022-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans |
2022-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans |
2022-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2022-04-12 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2022-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | S adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | S Offered |