MO SCR25 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Applies to Congress for the calling of an Article V convention of the states to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution regarding term limits for members of Congress

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applies to Congress for the calling of an Article V convention of the states to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution regarding term limits for members of Congress

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-10 - House - House: SCR 25 (*HA 1) SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2022-05-10 - House - House: SCR 25 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-10HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2022-05-10HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2022-05-10HouseH Third Read and Passed
2022-05-10HouseHA 1 H offered & defeated (McDaniel)--(4905S01.01H)
2022-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2022-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2022-04-27HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2022-04-27HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws
2022-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws
2022-04-21HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2022-04-19HouseReferred H General Laws
2022-04-19HouseH Second Read
2022-04-14HouseH First Read
2022-04-14SenateS Third Read and Passed
2022-04-07SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2022-04-07SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2022-03-22SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2022-01-13SenateSecond Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2022-01-11SenateS First Read

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback