MO SCR22 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the statewide mission of Missouri Southern State University
Title
Modifies the statewide mission of Missouri Southern State University
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [R] | Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | H Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions for Third Reading |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2024-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass H Higher Education |
2024-04-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Higher Education |
2024-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education |
2024-04-02 | House | Re-referred H Higher Education |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education |
2024-03-18 | House | H Second Read |
2024-03-14 | House | H First Read |
2024-03-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | S First Read |