MO SCR16 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges President Joe Biden and administration officials to approve the TC Energy Keystone XL pipeline
Title
Urges President Joe Biden and administration officials to approve the TC Energy Keystone XL pipeline
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-04-22 | Senate | H Second Read |
2021-04-21 | Senate | H First Read |
2021-04-20 | Senate | S adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S offered |