MO SCR11 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes October 2021 as "Hydrocephalus Awareness Month" in Missouri

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes October 2021 as "Hydrocephalus Awareness Month" in Missouri

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateReferred H Health and Mental Health Policy
2021-05-03SenateH Second Read
2021-04-29SenateH First Read
2021-04-29SenateS adopted, as amended
2021-04-29SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(2425S01.01S)
2021-04-22SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-04-20SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-04-13SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-04-07SenateHearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-02-23SenateReferred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-02-22SenateS offered

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback