MO SCR10 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the statutorily required independent audit of the State Auditor
Title
Authorizes the statutorily required independent audit of the State Auditor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - House: SCRs FOR THIRD READING - SCR 10 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | H adopted |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2023-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Regulatory Oversight |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Government Efficiency and Downsizing |
2023-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Government Efficiency and Downsizing |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred H Government Efficiency and Downsizing |
2023-04-05 | House | H Second Read |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2023-04-04 | Senate | S adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | S Offered |