MO SCR10 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Missouri Congressional delegation to make changes to the school lunch program in the Child Nutrition Act Reauthorization in 2015
Title
Urges the Missouri Congressional delegation to make changes to the school lunch program in the Child Nutrition Act Reauthorization in 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | H adopted |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2015-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2015-04-28 | House | Hearing Scheduled H Agriculture Policy (12:30 p.m. - HR 6) |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | S adopted |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | S Offered |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1562224 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR10.pdf |