MO SB995 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 995-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 995-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows entertainment facilities to sell alcoholic beverages through the use of mobile applications
Title
Allows entertainment facilities to sell alcoholic beverages through the use of mobile applications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 995-Riddle |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | S First Read--SB 995-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=25868844 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB995.pdf |