MO SB98 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that all school restrooms, locker rooms, and shower rooms accessible for use by multiple students shall be designated for and use by male or female students only

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that all school restrooms, locker rooms, and shower rooms accessible for use by multiple students shall be designated for and use by male or female students only

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 98-Emery
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback