MO SB977 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits misrepresenting a product as meat that is not derived from harvested production livestock or poultry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits misrepresenting a product as meat that is not derived from harvested production livestock or poultry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateVoted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-02-26SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-02-15SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-01-31SenateS First Read--SB 977-Crawford

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback