MO SB977 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of restraints on children under the age of 17 and pregnant and post-postpartum offenders during court proceedings except in certain circumstances
Title
Prohibits the use of restraints on children under the age of 17 and pregnant and post-postpartum offenders during court proceedings except in certain circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 977-Nasheed |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=25586066 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB977.pdf |