MO SB966 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 966-Schaaf
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers powers of the Missouri Consolidated Health Care Plan Board to the Office of Administration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transfers powers of the Missouri Consolidated Health Care Plan Board to the Office of Administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-13SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 966-Schaaf
2016-04-19SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2016-03-31SenateReported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2016-02-11SenateVoted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2016-02-04SenateHearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2016-01-28SenateSecond Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2016-01-25SenateS First Read--SB 966-Schaaf

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback