MO SB966 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 966-Lager
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 966-Lager
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to the ethical behavior of public officials and lobbyists
Title
Modifies the law relating to the ethical behavior of public officials and lobbyists
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 966-Lager |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Point of order S withdrawn |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Point of order - Taken under advisement |
2014-04-14 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Holsman)--(6083S03.01S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | SS S offered (Lager)--(6083S.03F) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 966-Lager |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=31479634 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB966.pdf |