MO SB963 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Children's Division
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Children's Division
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | S First Read--SB 963-Wallingford |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=25164361 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB963.pdf |