MO SB951 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (4158S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (4158S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows medical marijuana for medical use and provides that it shall be taxed at 8 percent of the purchase price
Title
Allows medical marijuana for medical use and provides that it shall be taxed at 8 percent of the purchase price
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (4158S.05C) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 951-Holsman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=31394939 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB951.pdf |