MO SB949 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to reading intervention in schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to reading intervention in schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
2018-05-17HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2018-05-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-14HouseHearing Conducted H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-11HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-05-11HouseH Second Read
2018-05-10HouseH First Read
2018-05-10SenateS Third Read and Passed
2018-05-09SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-05-08SenatePerfected
2018-05-08SenateSS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(5339S.08F)
2018-05-08SenateSS for SCS S withdrawn
2018-04-04SenateBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-04-04SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Nasheed)--(5339S06.05S)
2018-04-04SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hummel)--(5339S06.03S)
2018-04-04SenateSS for SCS S offered (Emery)--(5339S.06F)
2018-03-29SenateReported from S Education Committee w/SCS
2018-03-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (5339S.04C)
2018-02-20SenateHearing Conducted S Education Committee
2018-01-25SenateSecond Read and Referred S Education Committee
2018-01-23SenateS First Read--SB 949-Emery

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback