MO SB931 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS) (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS) (In Fiscal Review)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to corporations
Title
Modifies provisions relating to corporations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS) (In Fiscal Review) |
2022-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2022-05-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-05-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-05-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-05-02 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-21 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-20 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-04-06 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Williams)--(3709S08.03S) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Wieland)--(3709S08.04S) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(3709S08.07S) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Luetkemeyer)--(3709S08.08S) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(3709S.08F) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2022-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (3709S.03C) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |