MO SB93 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the length of terms of office for certain members of the Kansas City Public School board of directors to ensure terms are staggered
Title
Modifies the length of terms of office for certain members of the Kansas City Public School board of directors to ensure terms are staggered
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials |
2017-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Elections and Elected Officials |
2017-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elections and Elected Officials |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Elections and Elected Officials |
2017-03-24 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-16 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-16 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted (0054S.04C) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (0054S.04C) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 93-Curls |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |