MO SB93 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Campus Free Expression Act to protect free expression on the campuses of public institutions of higher education
Title
Creates the Campus Free Expression Act to protect free expression on the campuses of public institutions of higher education
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Education (Pursuant to H Rule 27.5) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Higher Education |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Higher Education |
2015-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred H Higher Education Committee |
2015-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-02 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-30 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-02-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (0582S.03C) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 93-Emery |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |