MO SB921 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to payments for prescription drugs
Title
Enacts provisions relating to payments for prescription drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |