MO SB919 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-04 - Referred H Elections Committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-04 - Referred H Elections Committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the date for submission of a consolidated public library district's annual report to the district board, county commission, and state library
Title
Changes the date for submission of a consolidated public library district's annual report to the district board, county commission, and state library
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Referred H Elections Committee | |
2010-03-23 | H Second Read | |
2010-03-22 | H First Read | |
2010-03-22 | S Third Read and Passed - Consent | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2010-03-01 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent | |
2010-02-22 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2010-02-08 | S First Read--SB 919-Ridgeway |