MO SB918 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to working animals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to working animals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 918 (*HA 11) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 73 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseH Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
2018-05-11HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-11HouseBill Placed Back on Formal Calendar
2018-05-08HouseBill placed in Informal Calendar
2018-05-08HouseHA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(5996H09.16H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Houghton)--(5996H09.11H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Berry)--(5996H09.07H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roeber)--(5996H09.17H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2018-05-08HouseHA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Berry)--(5996H09.31H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 8 to HCS H offered (Curtman)--(5996H09.24H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roeber)--(5996H09.14H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2018-05-08HouseHA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(5996H09.26H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered (Cornejo)--(5996H09.06H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Houghton)--(5996H09.08H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2018-05-08HouseHA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(5996H09.29H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered (Brattin)--(5996H09.04H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shaul)--(5996H09.10H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2018-05-08HouseHA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wood)--(5996H09.25H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Roden)--(5996H09.13H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered (Alferman)--(5996H09.05H)
2018-05-08HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Houghton)--(5996H09.09H)
2018-05-07HouseBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-05-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-05-03HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-05-03HouseExecutive Session Conducted H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-04-30HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-04-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy
2018-04-24HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy
2018-04-17HouseHearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy
2018-04-04HouseReferred H Agriculture Policy
2018-03-05HouseH Second Read
2018-03-01HouseH First Read
2018-03-01SenateS Third Read and Passed
2018-02-27SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-02-27SenatePerfected
2018-02-27SenateSS for SCS S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(5996S.08F)
2018-02-27SenateBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-02-12SenateReported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS
2018-02-07SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (5996S.04C)
2018-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-01-25SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2018-01-16SenateS First Read--SB 918-Munzlinger

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback