MO SB918 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to communicable diseases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to communicable diseases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-17SenateVoted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2014-04-03SenateHearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2014-03-13SenateSecond Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
2014-02-25SenateS First Read--SB 918-Holsman

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback