MO SB908 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Koenig [R] | Rep. Ben Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 908 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 111 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 908 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 908 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: SB 908 (HA 2 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: SB 908 (*HA 2 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 80 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: SB 908 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 908 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: SB 908 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: SB 908 (HA 2 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: SB 908 (*HA 2 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 80 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: SB 908 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | S Bills with H Amendments |
2022-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2022-05-12 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2022-05-12 | House | HA 5 to HCS H withdrawn |
2022-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered (Lovasco)--(3714H06.68H) |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 4 to HCS H withdrawn |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 2 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Taylor-139)--(3714H06.82H) |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Merideth)--(3714H06.75H) |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Christofanelli)--(3714H06.05H) |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(3714H06.26H) |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3714H06.01H) |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hovis)--(3714H06.77H) |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Hudson)--(3714H06.01H) |
2022-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Baker)--(3714H06.14H) |
2022-05-04 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-06 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2022-04-06 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Ways and Means Committee - Consent vote adopted (3714S.05C) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (3714S.05C) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |