MO SB894 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to education curriculum involving science and technology

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to education curriculum involving science and technology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - House: SB 894 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 121 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-13SenateVetoed by Governor
2018-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2018-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2018-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2018-05-03SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2018-05-03HouseS Third Read and Passed
2018-05-03HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2018-05-02HouseH Third Read and Passed
2018-05-02HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2018-05-02HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(5880H09.07H)
2018-05-02HouseHA 3 to HCS H adopted
2018-05-02HouseHA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Wood)--(5880H09.31H)
2018-05-02HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered (Swan)--(5880H09.18H)
2018-05-02HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Korman)--(5880H09.20H)
2018-05-02HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(5880H09.15H)
2018-04-30HouseBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-04-27HouseLaid over (H)
2018-04-26HouseTaken up (H)
2018-04-26HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-04-26HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-04-23HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2018-04-19HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-04-18HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-04-11HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2018-04-11HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education
2018-04-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education
2018-04-09HouseHearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education
2018-04-04HouseReferred H Elementary and Secondary Education
2018-03-12HouseH Second Read
2018-03-08HouseH First Read
2018-03-08SenateS Third Read and Passed
2018-03-08SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-03-08SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-03-05SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2018-03-05SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-03-01SenatePerfected
2018-03-01SenateSS for SCS S offered & adopted (Libla)--(5880S.08F)
2018-02-22SenateReported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS
2018-02-20SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 894 & 921) Economic Development Committee (5880S.07C)
2018-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee
2018-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee
2018-01-10SenateS First Read--SB 894-Libla

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback