MO SB890 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 727 & 890)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 727 & 890)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the certificate of need law
Title
Repeals the certificate of need law
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 727 & 890) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |