MO SB890 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a rule for determining proper venue in cases alleging a tort in which the plaintiff was first injured in connection with any railroad operations outside the state of Missouri
Title
Creates a rule for determining proper venue in cases alleging a tort in which the plaintiff was first injured in connection with any railroad operations outside the state of Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-04-24 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred H Transportation Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-10 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee to Floor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | S First Read--SB 890-Kehoe |