MO SB885 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions pertaining to the storage and dispensing of motor fuel
Title
Modifies provisions pertaining to the storage and dispensing of motor fuel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-02-03 | S First Read--SB 885-Schaefer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3241916 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB885.pdf |