MO SB879 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to fire protection services
Title
Creates provisions relating to fire protection services
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |