MO SB875 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows $9,999 in an irrevocable trust for certain funeral expenses to not be considered an asset when determining eligibility for public assistance
Title
Allows $9,999 in an irrevocable trust for certain funeral expenses to not be considered an asset when determining eligibility for public assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-04-02 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-02-29 | S First Read--SB 875-Goodman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3098432 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB875.pdf |