MO SB869 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to employment security
Title
Modifies provisions relating to employment security
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 869-Kehoe |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71153466 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB869.pdf |