MO SB866 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Preempts local laws that would modify current law governing the manner in which traditional installment loan lenders are allowed to make loans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preempts local laws that would modify current law governing the manner in which traditional installment loan lenders are allowed to make loans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10HouseLegislature voted to override Governor's veto
2014-09-10HouseH adopted motion to override Governor's veto
2014-09-10HouseS adopted motion to override Governor's veto
2014-07-10HouseVetoed by Governor
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30HouseReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-14HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-14HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-05-07HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-05HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-05-05HouseReported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee
2014-05-05HouseVoted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee
2014-05-05HouseHearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee
2014-05-01HouseReferred H Financial Institutions Committee
2014-05-01HouseH Second Read
2014-04-30HouseH First Read
2014-04-30SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-04-24SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-04-23SenatePerfected
2014-04-23SenateSS, as amended, S adopted
2014-04-23SenateSA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(5808S02.01S)
2014-04-23SenateSS S offered (Wasson)--(5808S.02F)
2014-04-14SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-04-01SenateReported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor
2014-03-26SenateVoted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2014-03-10SenateHearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2014-02-27SenateSecond Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2014-02-13SenateS First Read--SB 866-Wasson

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback