MO SB865 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 865-Nieves
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 865-Nieves
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to dogs
Title
Modifies provisions relating to dogs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 865-Nieves |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 865-Nieves |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=30181550 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB865.pdf |