MO SB854 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (5587S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to emergency communication services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to emergency communication services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (5587S.02C)
2018-01-31SenateHearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2018-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 854-Wallingford

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback