MO SB850 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to criminal laws
Title
Modifies provisions relating to criminal laws
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-03-28 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Razer)--(4329S05.26S) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Bean)--(4329S.05F) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2022-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4329S.03C) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |