MO SB846 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 846-Richard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 846-Richard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that an attorney shall not collect a contingency of more than a specified percentage of damages
Title
Provides that an attorney shall not collect a contingency of more than a specified percentage of damages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 846-Richard |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | S First Read--SB 846-Richard |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29952341 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB846.pdf |