MO SB836 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 836 & 800-Munzlinger, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the Governor to convey certain state properties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the Governor to convey certain state properties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16SenateS Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 836 & 800-Munzlinger, with SCS
2014-04-14SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-04-01SenateReported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS
2014-03-27SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 836 & 800) S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5845S.03C)
2014-03-05SenateHearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-02-27SenateSecond Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2014-02-06SenateS First Read--SB 836-Munzlinger

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback