MO SB828 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals wharfage taxes on landings made at certain wharfs
Title
Repeals wharfage taxes on landings made at certain wharfs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |