MO SB827 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to fees for copies of birth, death, and marriage certificates for certain individuals
Title
Modifies the law relating to fees for copies of birth, death, and marriage certificates for certain individuals
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 827-Sater |
2017-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB827.pdf |