MO SB82 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0963S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a tax credit for urban farms located in a food desert

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a tax credit for urban farms located in a food desert

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0963S.02C)
2021-03-04SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback