MO SB812 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (4343S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (4343S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Sexual Assault Survivors' Bill of Rights" and the "Missouri Rights of Victims of Sexual Assault Task Force"
Title
Establishes the "Sexual Assault Survivors' Bill of Rights" and the "Missouri Rights of Victims of Sexual Assault Task Force"
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (4343S.05C) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 812-Sater |
2019-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled |