MO SB808 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 777 & 808)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 777 & 808)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to employment security
Title
Creates new provisions relating to employment security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Bill Combined (w/SCS SB's 777 & 808) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |