MO SB806 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts with a certain number of gifted students to establish a state-approved program for such students
Title
Requires school districts with a certain number of gifted students to establish a state-approved program for such students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |