MO SB804 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Donated Food tax credit and expands such credit to include donations to soup kitchens and homeless shelters
Title
Reauthorizes the Donated Food tax credit and expands such credit to include donations to soup kitchens and homeless shelters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 804-Nasheed |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB804.pdf |