MO SB801 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to child protection
Title
Modifies provisions relating to child protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Welfare Committee w/SCS |
2024-02-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Welfare Committee (4449S.02C) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |