MO SB8 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to flashing lights on motor vehicles and equipment
Title
Modifies the law relating to flashing lights on motor vehicles and equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 8 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 8 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 8 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 8 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 125 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: SB 8 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: SB 8 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 8 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 8 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 8 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 125 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: SB 8 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: SB 8 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2017-05-12 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2017-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2017-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(0101S03.1SR) |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | H distributes CCR--(0101S03.1SR) |
2017-05-05 | House | S conferees appointed: Munzlinger, Rowden, Schatz, Schupp, Hummel |
2017-05-03 | House | H conferees appointed: Rhoads, Bernskoetter, Fitzwater-144, McCreery, Mitten |
2017-05-03 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2017-05-01 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, as amended., HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 7, HA 8, as amended & HA 9, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2017-04-25 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC defeated |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 9, as amended, H adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 3 to HA 9 H offered & adopted (Marshall)--(0101S01.28H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 2 to HA 9 H offered & adopted (Kolkmeyer)--(0101S01.29H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 1 to HA 9 H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0101S01.22H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 9 H offered (Redmon)--(0101S01.14H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 8, as amended, H adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 1 to HA 8 H offered & adopted (Davis)--(0101S01.25H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 8 H offered (Korman)--(0101S01.19H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 7 H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(0101S01.10H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 6 H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(0101S01.16H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Fitzwater-144)--(0101S01.03H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Roden)--(0101S01.08H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 3, as amended, H adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 H offered & adopted (Korman)--(0101S01.21H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 3 H offered (Davis)--(0101S01.06H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(0101S01.23H) |
2017-04-25 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(0101S01.04H) |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-03-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2017-03-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2017-02-16 | House | H Second Read |
2017-02-15 | House | H First Read |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent - EC adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 8-Munzlinger |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |