MO SB795 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding the duties and functions of the Joint Committee on Legislative Research
Title
Modifies provisions regarding the duties and functions of the Joint Committee on Legislative Research
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 795-Hough |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27540308 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB795.pdf |