MO SB794 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (5401S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (5401S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to gubernatorial appointments
Title
Modifies provisions relating to gubernatorial appointments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (5401S.02C) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 794-Romine, et al |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69680271 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB794.pdf |