MO SB784 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 784-Wallingford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 784-Wallingford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the option to donate income tax refunds to the Missouri National Guard Foundation Fund
Title
Extends the option to donate income tax refunds to the Missouri National Guard Foundation Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 784-Wallingford |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 784-Wallingford |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27213643 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB784.pdf |