MO SB766 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee (4104S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee (4104S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a provision relating to allegations of sexual misconduct against private school employees
Title
Establishes a provision relating to allegations of sexual misconduct against private school employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education and Workforce Development Committee (4104S.02C) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education and Workforce Development Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |